CT HB06914 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) exempt from registration for a demolition permit a person engaged in the disassembly of nonstructural building materials for the purpose of reusing and recycling the building materials, and (2) require an applicant for a demolition permit to furnish a written declaration that the town or city and its agents shall be saved harmless from any claim arising out of negligence of the applicant or the applicant's agents or employees during the demolition.
Title
An Act Concerning Demolition Licensure And Demolition Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 366 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-10 | House | Public Act 15-131 |
2015-06-01 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-29 | House | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 389 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | House Passed |
2015-03-24 | House | File Number 191 |
2015-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 135 |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |