CT HB06913 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide transparency and identify potential cost-saving measures.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Construction Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2017-03-28 | House | File Number 261 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 201 |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |