CT HB06899 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand guardianship opportunities for children in foster care by permitting subsidized guardianship for fictive kin and to make conforming changes to comply with the requirements of the federal Preventing Sex Trafficking and Strengthening Families Act.
Title
An Act Expanding Guardianship Opportunities For Children And Implementing Provisions Of The Federal Preventing Sex Trafficking And Strengthening Families Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 460 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 15-199 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 613 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | File Number 909 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-27 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8108 |
2015-04-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-21 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 160 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 128 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |