CT HB06893 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the development of vacant lots depicted on subdivision or resubdivision plans filed with municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Adjustments To Gross Assessments Of Taxable Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 481 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 336 AS AMENDED (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 336 AS AMENDED (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | House | Public Act 23-181 |
2023-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 628 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2023-06-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10140 |
2023-04-11 | House | File Number 494 |
2023-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 322 |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |