CT HB06883 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a Corrections to College Program to assist youthful offenders to reenter the community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A "corrections To College Program" At Regional Community-technical Colleges For Youthful Offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 185
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 135
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback