CT HB06882 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Department of Education to conduct a review of the education laws every two years to identify obsolete and duplicative mandates on the department and boards of education; (2) establish the Education Mandates Review Task Force to review and make recommendations concerning the repeal of or amendment to education mandates that are overly burdensome; (3) align existing in-service training requirements concerning school violence prevention training with those required under school security and safety plans; and (4) eliminate the completion of a capstone project as part of the high school graduation requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Education Mandate Relief And Other Technical And Assorted Revisions And Additions To The Education And Early Childhood Education Statutes.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Rep. Timothy Ackert [R] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] |
Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 468 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 469 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 470 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 216 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 469 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 470 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 216 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | House | Public Act 23-160 |
2023-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9962 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9960 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | Senate | File Number 860 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 585 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-31 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-31 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9024 |
2023-04-13 | House | File Number 591 |
2023-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 362 |
2023-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |