CT HB06832 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 234
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 234
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal the threshold project development research and manufacturing application center programs and the high performance work organization statutes in order to remove certain paperwork filing requirements and administrative barriers that make it more difficult for businesses to seek financial assistance.
Title
An Act Repealing The High Performance Work Organization Program And Threshold Project Provisions Concerning Financial Assistance Awarded By The Department Of Economic And Community Development And Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 234 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 165 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |