CT HB06829 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit publishers of electronic books and digital audiobooks from including certain restrictions in contracts or license agreements with libraries in the state.
Title
An Act Making Certain Terms In Electronic Book And Digital Audiobook License Agreements Or Contracts Unenforceable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2023-06-07 | House | House Designated House Amendment Schedule B 10086 |
2023-06-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8973 |
2023-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-13 | House | File Number 586 |
2023-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 357 |
2023-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |