CT HB06824 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - File Number 800
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - File Number 800
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June Thirtieth 2017, And Making Appropriations Therefor And Other Provisions Related To Revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | File Number 800 |
2015-05-11 | House | House Calendar Number 541 |
2015-05-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 10:00 AM |
2015-04-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-06824-R00-HB.htm |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-06824-R01-HB.htm |