CT HB06819 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow parking tickets to be sent by regular or certified mail to the registered owner of a motor vehicle.
Title
An Act Requiring An Investigation Into Options For Operation Of State Rail Lines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 369 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 225 |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |