CT HB06809 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-19 - File Number 800
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-19 - File Number 800
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To incentivize the retention of vegetation along the state's rivers and streams for water quality and pollution control purposes.
Title
An Act Concerning Financial Incentives For Certain Streamside Buffers And Training For Inland Wetland Commission Members.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 137 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | File Number 800 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 523 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-17 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8055 |
2023-04-11 | House | File Number 485 |
2023-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 312 |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |