CT HB06805 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require annual hearing screenings for every child who is currently receiving services under the Department of Developmental Services birth-to-three program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Birth-to-three Program And Hearing Tests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 338 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-11 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-11 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-05 | House | Public Act 15-81 |
2015-05-29 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 551 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 368 |
2015-04-01 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | New File by Committee on Public Health |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-10 | House | File Number 41 |
2015-03-10 | House | House Calendar Number 61 |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |