CT HB06749 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 904
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 904
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enable zoning commissions and lay people to more easily understand the requirements of section 8-2 of the general statutes and provide an administrative mechanism to promote municipal compliance with said section.
Title
An Act To Reorganize The Zoning Enabling Act And Promote Municipal Compliance.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Jason Rojas [D] |
Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 108 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | File Number 904 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 495 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8675 |
2019-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Housing |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Housing |
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 573 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 346 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |