CT HB06737 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Program Review and Investigations Committee concerning transitional services for youth and young adults with autism spectrum disorder.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Program Review And Investigations Committee Concerning Transitional Services For Youth And Young Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 461 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-209 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 615 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | House Passed |
2015-05-20 | House | File Number 867 |
2015-05-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-20 | House | New File by Committee on Education |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/19/15 5:00 PM |
2015-05-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2015-04-30 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-30 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | File Number 562 |
2015-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 346 |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |