CT HB06731 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt property classified as farm land under Public Act 490 from the estate tax.
Title
An Act Concerning The Treatment Of Certain Farm Land For Purposes Of The Estate Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-17 | House | File Number 80 |
2015-03-17 | House | House Calendar Number 76 |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-06 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |