CT HB06721 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide emergency dispatchers with portal-to-portal workers' compensation coverage.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation And Portal-to-portal Coverage For Telecommunicators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Public Act 23-80 |
2023-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-19 | Senate | File Number 805 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 521 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-17 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8134 |
2023-05-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-02 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-15 | House | File Number 76 |
2023-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 73 |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |