CT HB06703 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Reduce youth violence and gang-related activity; and (2) establish a criminal offense for a person to recruit a minor to participate in a gang.
Title
An Act Concerning Youth Violence And Gang Activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 619 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 371 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 371 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Public Act 13-302 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 705 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-04 | House | House Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-06 | House | File Number 745 |
2013-05-06 | House | House Calendar Number 524 |
2013-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM |
2013-04-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-11 | House | Public Hearing 04/15 |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |