CT HB06695 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To protect youth from conversion therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Protection Of Youth From Conversion Therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 114 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 81 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 82 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-05-18SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-05-16SenatePublic Act 17-5
2017-05-10SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2017-05-10SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2017-05-10SenateIn Concurrence
2017-05-10SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-10SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-04SenateFile Number 719
2017-05-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 392
2017-05-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-02SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
2017-05-02HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-02HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6504
2017-04-13HouseFile Number 586
2017-04-13HouseHouse Calendar Number 388
2017-04-13HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-04-13HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-07HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-24HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-03-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2017-03-16HouseDrafted by Committee
2017-03-10HouseVote to Draft
2017-03-02HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2017-02-06HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06695&which_year=2017
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-06695-R00-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-06695-R01-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-06695-R02-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/ACT/pa/2017PA-00005-R00HB-06695-PA.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TS/h/2017HB-06695-R00PH-CV91-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TS/h/2017HB-06695-R00PH-CV238-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TS/h/2017HB-06695-R00PH-CV283-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00082-R00HB06695-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00081-R00HB06695-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/s/2017SV-00114-R00HB06695-SV.htm

Bill Comments

feedback