CT HB06695 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make revisions to the higher education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Higher Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 323 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 167 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 167 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-02 | House | Public Act 15-63 |
2015-05-28 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 581 |
2015-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | House Passed |
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 229 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 160 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-06 | House | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |