CT HB06688 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning A Highway Use Fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Highway Use Fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 429 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 354 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD A (Y: 53 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 355 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD C (Y: 57 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 356 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD D (Y: 52 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 357 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act 21-177
2021-06-08SenateIn Concurrence
2021-06-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
2021-06-08SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
2021-06-08SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2021-06-08HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
2021-06-08HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 10647
2021-06-08HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10638
2021-06-08HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10604
2021-06-08HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10534
2021-06-06HouseEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06688&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06688-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00177-R00HB-06688-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10534-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/H/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00HD-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/H/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00HC-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/H/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00HB-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10642-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06688-R00-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06688-R00-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00LCO10534-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00LCO10604-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00LCO10638-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00LCO10642-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06688-R00LCO10647-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06688-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06688-R01-FN.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00357-R00HB06688-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00356-R00HB06688-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00355-R00HB06688-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00354-R00HB06688-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00429-R00HB06688-SV.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback