CT HB06676 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To promote public safety and compliance with the ban of certain motor vehicles on parkways in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Penalty For Commercial Vehicles On State Parkways.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] | Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D] |
Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2023-04-12 | House | File Number 532 |
2023-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 327 |
2023-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |