CT HB06644 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make various changes to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 550 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 13-208 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | Senate | File Number 887 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 677 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2013-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8219 |
2013-05-01 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-18 | House | File Number 580 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 367 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-01 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |