CT HB06640 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 227
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 227
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase access to housing in high opportunity areas for all families in the state by creating priority tiers within the Qualified Allocation Plan for purposes of allocating federal low income housing tax credits.
Title
An Act Concerning The Allocation Of Low Income Housing Tax Credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 227 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 158 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2015-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-03 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |