CT HB06635 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the head moderator, registrar of voters and municipal clerk to identify and correct any error in returns not later than seven days following an election.
Title
An Act Concerning Amended Election Returns.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 606 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | House | Public Act 13-296 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 503 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 514 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 331 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |