CT HB06634 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Senate Calendar Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Senate Calendar Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to allow municipalities to transfer some or all of their filing repository duties to the State Elections Enforcement Commission.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program For Municipal Campaign Finance Filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 585 |
2013-05-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | File Number 635 |
2013-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 423 |
2013-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |