CT HB06630 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate access by state marshals to personal information in motor vehicle records of the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
An Act Concerning Access By State Marshals To Records Of The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-25 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |
2011-05-25 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-24 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-28 | File Number 658 | |
2011-04-28 | House Calendar Number 387 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-28 | Public Hearing 04/01 | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |