CT HB06603 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow two or more municipalities in any regional tourism district to jointly appoint one representative to the regional tourism district boards of directors, and (2) require that a representative of the Connecticut Tourism Coalition be a member of the Connecticut Tourism Council.
Title
An Act Concerning Tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 372 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 21-94 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | File Number 778 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 542 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9634 |
2021-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 212 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 183 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |