CT HB06603 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure adequate and safe state-assisted housing for the elderly and younger persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Certain Tenants Of State-funded Public Housing Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 384 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Special Act 17-19 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 574 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2017-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8348 |
2017-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6655 |
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | File Number 121 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 116 |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2017-02-01 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |