CT HB06582 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Department to consider specific circumstances when determining whether an individual who performs instructional, research or principal administrative duties at an institution of higher education is eligible to receive unemployment compensation.
Title
An Act Concerning Unemployment Benefits For Adjunct Faculty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-04-07 | House | File Number 308 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 240 |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |