CT HB06575 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a working group to examine risk-limiting audits for election results.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Risk-limiting Audits For Election Results.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-31HouseJoint Favorable
2021-03-05HousePublic Hearing 03/10
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback