CT HB06565 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate a town's ability to phase in an assessment decrease resulting from the town's revaluation of real property.
Title
An Act Eliminating A Town's Ability To Phase In A Real Property Assessment Decrease And Allowing A Property Tax Abatement For Emergency Medical Technicians.
Sponsors
House Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] |
Sen. Andrea Stillman [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] | Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 569 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-11 | House | Public Act 13-204 |
2013-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-24 | House | File Number 855 |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 651 |
2013-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7522 |
2013-05-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-21 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-24 | House | File Number 632 |
2013-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 420 |
2013-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |