CT HB06559 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Office of Early Childhood.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Office Of Early Childhood.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 420 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 262 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 262 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-172 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | File Number 784 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 546 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8543 |
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | House | File Number 244 |
2021-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 205 |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |