CT HB06555 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a process for legislative oversight and approval of the allocation of COVID-19 relief funds from the federal government.
Title
An Act Concerning Legislative Oversight And Approval Of Covid-19 Relief Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 76 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 20 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 20 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Special Act 21-1 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 85 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-03-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5573 |
2021-03-11 | House | File Number 44 |
2021-03-11 | House | House Calendar Number 66 |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |