CT HB06550 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the loss ratio guarantee and the thirty-day deemer provision for individual health policy rate filings.
Title
An Act Concerning Loss Ratio Guarantees For Individual Health Insurance Policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 460 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-11 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-06 | House | Public Act 13-149 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Calendar Number 640 |
2013-05-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 231 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 174 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |