CT HB06546 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit individual and group health insurance policies from imposing a coinsurance, copayment, deductible or other out-of-pocket expense for physical therapy services rendered on each date of service by a physical therapist that is greater than a coinsurance, copayment, deductible or other out-of-pocket expense imposed for services rendered by a primary care physician or for an office visit to an osteopath.
Title
An Act Concerning Copayments For Physical Therapy Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 584 PASS (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 583 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8759 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 338 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 583 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8759 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 338 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 13-307 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8759 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 693 |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8351 |
2013-05-01 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 230 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 173 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |