CT HB06545 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - File Number 840
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - File Number 840
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes in Medicaid prior authorization requirements to ensure that eligible recipients and prescribers are informed of prior authorization denials.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Drug Step Therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | File Number 840 |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 632 |
2013-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7296 |
2013-05-09 | House | File Number 781 |
2013-05-09 | House | House Calendar Number 540 |
2013-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |