CT HB06535 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) convene a working group to examine the employment and role of school resource officers in public schools, (2) conduct a study to determine whether classroom doors that can be locked from the inside and outside of the classroom should be included in school safety infrastructure criteria, (3) require the Department of Education to develop a state-wide plan for responding to large-scale school crisis events, and (4) require the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection to conduct random audits to ensure that the school security and safety plans are being developed and implemented in schools.
Title
An Act Concerning Issues Relating To School Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |