CT HB06518 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to statutes concerning the provision of emergency medical services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Standards Of Professional Conduct For Emergency Medical Service Personnel And Establishing An Emergency Medical Services Primary Area Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 596 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 332 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 332 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 13-306 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 698 |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8401 |
2013-04-18 | House | File Number 575 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 361 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |