CT HB06515 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Creating A Respectful And Open World For Natural Hair.
Title
An Act Creating A Respectful And Open World For Natural Hair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 45 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 16 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 16 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Act 21-2 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 46 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Emergency Certification |