CT HB06507 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Social Services, to develop a sliding tuition scale based on family income to be used in the calculation of the amount that a regional educational service center operating an interdistrict magnet school offering a preschool program may charge for tuition to the parent or guardian of a child enrolled in such preschool program.
Title
An Act Concerning A Sliding Tuition Scale For Preschool Programs Offered At Interdistrict Magnet School Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | House | File Number 549 |
2013-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 345 |
2013-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |