CT HB06506 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To continue state financial assistance to those child day care facilities and child day care centers that entered into a loan agreement prior to July 1, 2012, and whose loans are guaranteed by the state.
Title
An Act Concerning State-funded Child Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 497 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-11 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-06 | House | Special Act 13-16 |
2013-06-01 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-01 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 460 |
2013-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | File Number 463 |
2013-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 299 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |