CT HB06496 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the use of certain sites for soil material deposits, encourage healthy soils and expedite certain dredging requirements for marina basin applications.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Soil-related Initiatives.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Alexandra Kasser [D] | Rep. Charles Ferraro [R] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Thomas [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Maria Horn [D] | Rep. John-Michael Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 366 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 253 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 253 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 21-88 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | File Number 783 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 547 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8796 |
2021-05-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-31 | House | File Number 230 |
2021-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 191 |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |