CT HB06491 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a report on the comparisons of the salaries of administrators and the ratio of administrators to faculty and to students at the constituent units and central office of the Board of Regents for Higher Education with the salaries of administrators and the ratio of administrators to faculty and to students at peer public institutions of higher education and peer central offices of similar state university systems in the United States.
Title
An Act Requiring A Report From The Board Of Regents For Higher Education And The Board Of Trustees For The University Of Connecticut Regarding Administrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 449 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 (Y: 120 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 (Y: 120 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-11 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-06 | House | Public Act 13-143 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 506 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 505 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 322 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |