CT HB06490 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
The thrice-annual deficit reporting requirement in section 4-82a of the general statutes is duplicative of the monthly deficiency reporting requirement imposed by section 2-36 of the general statutes, as well as the monthly budget projection produced by the Office of Policy and Management in accordance with section 4-66 of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Grants In Lieu Of Taxes For Ledyard And Montville And Repealing A Deficit Reporting Requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 611 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | House | Public Act 13-291 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 601 |
2013-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-16 | House | File Number 529 |
2013-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 339 |
2013-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |