CT HB06481 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create special registration marker plates available to veterans and members of the armed forces who served during certain periods of war.
Title
An Act Concerning Special Registration Marker Plates For Veterans And Members Of The Armed Forces Who Served In Periods Of War.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Transportation |
2021-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |