CT HB06481 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend protections currently applicable to nonconforming buildings to nonconforming structures.
Title
An Act Concerning Enforcement Protection For Nonconforming Structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-10 | House | Public Act 13-9 |
2013-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-08 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 353 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 220 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 163 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |