CT HB06480 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To specify the funeral expenses covered by the sum paid by the state for certain veterans.
Title
An Act Concerning The Funeral Expenses Of Certain Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 362 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-21 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-18 | House | Public Act 21-112 |
2021-06-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 371 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | File Number 239 |
2021-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 200 |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |