CT HB06476 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To regulate certificates of insurance.
Title
An Act Concerning Certificates Of Insurance For Property And Casualty Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | File Number 366 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 245 |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |