CT HB06470 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To ease health care access by making permanent certain changes related to home health, telehealth and utilization review in the medical assistance program that were implemented by executive order during the COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
An Act Concerning Home Health, Telehealth And Utilization Review.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Maria Horn [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] |
Rep. William Petit [R] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | House | Public Act 21-133 |
2021-06-08 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-08 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-01 | House | File Number 772 |
2021-06-01 | House | Senate Calendar Number 531 |
2021-06-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-27 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9535 |
2021-04-06 | House | File Number 265 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 219 |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |