CT HB06439 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage the proper disposal of unwanted medication.
Title
An Act Concerning The Disposal And Collection Of Unused Medication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-17 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-18 | House | File Number 42 |
2013-03-18 | House | House Calendar Number 70 |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |